VA HB705 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Broadband services; prohibited features. Prohibits a provider of broadband services from offering or renewing services to consumers within any locality in the Commonwealth in which certain media is throttled, blocked, or prioritized on the basis of its content, format, host address, or source.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband services; prohibited features.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104542D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522161(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback