VA HB702 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB702
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Mandatory outpatient treatment; petition for review; efforts of the community services board. Clarifies that a community services board must make efforts to assist a person with complying with the provisions of a mandatory outpatient treatment order or order authorizing discharge to mandatory outpatient treatment following inpatient treatment and that only in cases in which a person fails to comply with a mandatory outpatient treatment or order authorizing discharge to mandatory outpatient treatment following inpatient treatment despite efforts of the community services board to assist the person may the community services board petition for review of the mandatory outpatient order or order authorizing discharge to mandatory outpatient treatment following inpatient treatment.
Title
Mandatory outpatient treatment; petition for review, efforts of the community services board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-04 | House | Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102364D |
Same As/Similar To
HB702 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote