VA HB695 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Worker training tax credit. Extends from 2022 to 2025 the sunset date for the worker training tax credit and expands credits with respect to courses at an Eligible Training Provider List-recognized institution to include courses at any Virginia public institution of higher education. Worker training tax credit. Extends from 2022 to 2025 the sunset date for the worker training tax credit and expands credits with respect to courses at an Eligible Training Provider List-recognized institution to include courses at any Virginia public institution of higher education.
Title
Worker training tax credit; clarifies definition of "eligible worker training," extends sunset date.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 431 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB695ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 22102662D-E |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB695E |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102662D |