VA HB691 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB691

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Office of the Prescription Drug Affordability Board; established. Establishes the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to study, review, and regulate the cost of prescription drugs in the Commonwealth, in consultation with a stakeholder work group appointed by the Board. The bill also establishes the Office of the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to provide staffing and administrative support to the Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Affordability Board and Office, etc.; established.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-04HouseContinued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-16HouseReferred from General Laws by voice vote
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101486D

Same As/Similar To

HB691 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22213.6(n/a)See Bill Text
22213.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback