VA HB691 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Circuit courts; number of judges in the Twenty-first and Twenty-second Judicial Circuits. Increases from two to three the maximum number of authorized judges in the Twenty-first Judicial Circuit (Martinsville, Patrick, Henry) and reduces from five to four the maximum number of authorized judges in the Twenty-second Judicial Circuit (Franklin, Pittsylvania, Danville). These adjustments are recommended in the National Center for State Courts report entitled "Virginia Judicial Workload Assessment Report," issued November 15, 2017. Additionally, the bill repeals provisions from 2014 that provide for the future reduction of the number of authorized judgeships in the Twenty-first Judicial Circuit from three to two.
Title
Circuit courts; number of judges in the Twenty-first and Twenty-second Judicial Circuits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103037D |