VA HB69 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable energy portfolio standard. Requires each investor-owned electric utility and distribution cooperative to participate in a renewable energy portfolio standard program commencing with calendar year 2013. Under the program, each utility is required to generate renewable energy or to purchase renewable energy certificates, or both, in amounts that start in 2013 at three percent of the total electric energy sold in the base year of 2007 and that increase to 20 percent of such amount in 2020 and thereafter. Failure to meet the required percentages will result in the assessment of alternative compliance payments, which are to be paid into the newly created Virginia Sustainable Energy Fund. The measure provides that an investor-owned electric utility that was authorized to receive a performance incentive as a consequence of its participation in the renewable portfolio standard program as it existed prior to the effective date of this act shall continue to receive the incentive until the utility's next biennial rate review proceeding.
Title
Renewable energy portfolio standard program; required participation of electric utility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy | |
2011-12-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-12-19 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101150D |