VA HB685 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Direct primary care agreements. Provides that the Commonwealth's insurance laws do not apply to direct primary care agreements. The measure further provides that (i) a direct primary care practice is not subject to the jurisdiction of the State Corporation Commission (SCC) and is not required to obtain a certificate of authority or license to market, sell, or offer to sell a direct primary care agreement; (ii) entering into a direct primary care agreement shall not be considered to be engaging in the business of insurance; and (iii) a direct primary care agreement is not a contract of insurance and is not subject to regulation by the SCC. The bill defines a direct primary care agreement as an agreement entered into between a health care provider and an individual patient under which the provider charges a predetermined fee as consideration for providing primary care to the patient, subject to certain conditions. A direct primary care practice is prohibited from submitting a claim to an insurer with respect to services provided to direct primary care patients covered by their direct primary care agreement, unless the services are outside the scope of the agreement.
Title
Direct primary care agreements; Commonwealth's insurance laws do not apply.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (34-Y 66-N) (Y: 35 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-04-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, May 20, 2016 | |
2016-04-20 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (34-Y 66-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (34-Y 66-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-04-06 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2016-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/16/16 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB685ER) |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-10 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 8-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105892D-S1 (87-Y 8-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB685S1 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee rejected (19-Y 21-N) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105892D-S1 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105892D-S1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB685H1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104748D-H1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104748D-H1 |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100539D |