VA HB685 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Solicitation, possession or production of child pornography by a minor. Provides that a minor who, upon the facts, could be found guilty of a first offense of possession, production, publication or solicitation of child pornography, may have his case deferred and dismissed by the court. The offense is separate and distinct; if the acts or activities violating this law also violate another provision of law, a prosecution under this law shall not prohibit or bar any prosecution or proceeding under such other provision. The penalty for violation is a Class 3 misdemeanor.
Title
Child pornography; solicitation, possession, or production thereof by a minor, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-12 | House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #5 Constitutional Law | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102434D |