VA HB680 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB680
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State plan for medical assistance services; case management services; individuals with severe traumatic brain injury. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to update the state plan for medical assistance services to include a provision for the payment of medical assistance for targeted case management services for individuals with severe traumatic brain injury. State plan for medical assistance services; case management services; individuals with severe traumatic brain injury. Directs the Board of Medical Assistance Services to update the state plan for medical assistance services to include a provision for the payment of medical assistance for targeted case management services for individuals with severe traumatic brain injury.
Title
Medical assistance services; state plan, case management service, individuals w/severe brain injury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011) | |
2022-08-04 | Governor: of adjournment of the 2022 Special Session l) | |
2022-08-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 11 (effective on the 1st day of the 4th month following the month | |
2022-07-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., August 4, 2022 | |
2022-07-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on July 28, 2022 |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-07-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-07-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB680ER) |
2022-07-20 | House | Enrolled |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-06-01 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) |
2022-06-01 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2022-06-01 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Lewis, Suetterlein |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Delegates: Hope, Orrock, Hodges |
2022-03-09 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-09 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 97-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 97-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101512D |
Same As/Similar To
HB680 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455