VA HB680 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Motor vehicle sales and use tax; semitrailers. Reduces the minimum motor vehicle sales and use tax on semitrailers from $75 to $35. The bill contains a reenactment clause regarding this change. The bill also directs the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to review the impact of the change in the minimum tax on Commonwealth Transportation Funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle sales and use tax; minimum tax on trailers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
2018-04-18HouseEnacted, Chapter 826 (effective - see bill)
2018-04-18SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled bill text (HB680ER2)
2018-04-18HouseReenrolled
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
2018-04-18SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2018-04-02HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-01HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB680ER)
2018-03-01HouseEnrolled
2018-02-28SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenatePassed by temporarily
2018-02-28SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 41-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (59-Y 41-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18101955D-E
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB680E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-09HouseRead first time
2018-02-07HouseReported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
2018-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101955D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5812402(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB680
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB680+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB680E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB680ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB680ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0826+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1002V0020+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0049+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0073+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0715+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0334+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB0680+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0763HB0680+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1644+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1252HB0680+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1259HB0680+HB0680
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1260HB0680+HB0680

Bill Comments

feedback