VA HB671 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Writ of actual innocence; bail hearings. Provides that when the attorney for the Commonwealth joins in a petition for a writ of actual innocence, the petitioner may move the circuit court that entered the felony conviction for a bail hearing.
Title
Writ of actual innocence; petitions, bail hearings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102743D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 327.10:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 327.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB671 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB671+hil |