VA HB67 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Disabled Veteran's Passport; service-connected disability. Entitles any veteran of the U.S. Armed Forces with a service-connected disability to a Disabled Veteran's Passport for free entry into state parks and discounted services. Current law limits such passport to veterans of the U.S. Armed Forces with a service-connected disability rating of 100 percent.
Title
Disabled Veteran's Passport; service-connected disability.
Sponsors
Del. Ellen Campbell [R] | Del. Jason Ballard [R] | Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Amy Laufer [D] |
Del. Ian Lovejoy [R] | Del. Michelle Maldonado [D] | Del. Kim Taylor [R] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2023-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100151D |