VA HB661 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N)
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation. Provides that workers' compensation benefits shall not be reduced for a disabled employee who refuses employment, if he is receiving benefits under the Line of Duty Act and such acceptance would cause the cessation of his Line of Duty benefits.
Title
Workers' compensation benefits; refusal of employment by disabled employee.
Sponsors
Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. James Scott [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor (0-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101586D |