VA HB649 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; occupational disease presumption; police dispatchers. Establishes a presumption that hypertension or heart disease causing the death or disability of full-time salaried police dispatchers is an occupational disease compensable under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
Workers' compensation; occupational disease presumption, police dispatchers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103905D |