VA HB649 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund. Lowers the minimum private investment to qualify for incentives from the Governor's Development Opportunity Fund for localities with a population of 100,000 or less with unemployment rates in excess of 150 percent of the state average.
Title
Governor's Development Opportunity Fund; lowers minimum private investment to qualify therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-11 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102113D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB649 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB649+hil |