VA HB647 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0412)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tree conservation ordinance. Provides that the ordinance may allow a locality to post on private property that is proposed to be redeveloped with one single-family home signs that notify the public that an infill lot grading plan is pending for review before the locality. The locality may not require the applicant to be responsible for such posting, and the failure to post the property shall not be a ground for denial of such grading plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tree conservation; locality to post signs on private property that is proposed to be redeveloped.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0412)
2016-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
2016-03-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 412 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
2016-03-04SenateSigned by President
2016-03-01HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-01HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB647ER)
2016-03-01HouseEnrolled
2016-02-26SenatePassed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2016-02-26SenateRead third time
2016-02-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2016-02-23SenateReported from Local Government (8-Y 5-N)
2016-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2016-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-10HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N)
2016-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (83-Y 16-N)
2016-02-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB647H1
2016-02-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 16104912D-H1
2016-02-09HouseRead second time
2016-02-08HouseRead first time
2016-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 16104912D-H1
2016-02-05HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2016-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
2016-02-03HouseReconsidered by Counties, Cities and Towns Subcommittee #2
2016-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N)
2016-01-18HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2016-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2016-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103958D

Same As/Similar To

SB361 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152961.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB647
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB647+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB647H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB647ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0412+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0702V0002+HB0647
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0702V0011+HB0647
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H07V0025+HB0647
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0403+HB0647
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S07V0056+HB0647
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0636HB0647+HB0647
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0669HB0647+HB0647

Bill Comments 750

feedback