VA HB647 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. Places limits and conditions on use of Commonwealth revenues to support Phase II of the Dulles Corridor Metrorail Project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MWAA; limits use of Commonwelth revenues to support Phase II of Dulles Corridor Metrorail Project.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-12HouseLeft in Appropriations
2014-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2014-01-10HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation
2014-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2014-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102892D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback