VA HB647 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Issuance of driver’s licenses to minors. Requires that a licensee who is under the age of 18 at the time that the ceremony is held to issue an original driver’s license be accompanied by a parent, guardian, spouse, or other person in loco parentis. Under current law, a licensee must be accompanied at the ceremony if he is under the age of 18 at the time the application for licensure is made. This bill is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's licenses; minors to be accompanied by parent, guardian, etc., to ceremony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-28 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)
2012-02-28 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 30 (effective 7/1/12)
2012-02-16 Senate: Signed by President
2012-02-15 House: Signed by Speaker
2012-02-15 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB647ER)
2012-02-15 House: Enrolled
2012-02-13 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2012-02-13 Senate: Read third time
2012-02-10 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2012-02-08 Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2012-02-01 Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation
2012-02-01 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2012-01-31 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2012-01-31 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2012-01-30 House: Read second time and engrossed
2012-01-27 House: Read first time
2012-01-26 House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
2012-01-24 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2012-01-20 House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3
2012-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on Transportation
2012-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100581D

Same As/Similar To

SB113 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462336(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback