VA HB647 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Unemployment benefits; part-time employment and training programs. Provides that certain individuals who have exhausted eligibility for unemployment benefits and who are enrolled in approved training programs are eligible for up to 26 weeks of additional benefits. The measure also provides that an individual who was employed part time during at least one-half of the weeks of work in the individual's base period is deemed to satisfy the requirement that he be available for work and actively seeking and unable to obtain suitable work if he is available for and actively seeking work that is comparable to his part-time work experience in his base period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment benefits; eligibility of individuals part-time employed and in training programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-16 House: Left in Commerce and Labor
2010-02-04 House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N)
2010-01-26 House: Assigned C & L sub: #2
2010-01-12 House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2010-01-12 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102109D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
602612(n/a)See Bill Text
602613.1(n/a)See Bill Text
602618(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback