VA HB645 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-24 - Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-24 - Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; party identification on ballots; constitutional officers. Extends to elections for constitutional officers the requirement that ballots identify the nominating political party for party candidates and identify independent candidates as such. Currently, this requirement applies only to federal, statewide, and General Assembly elections.
Title
Elections; party identification on ballots, constitutional officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-24 | House | Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2014-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102299D |