VA HB64 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Local regulation; making of fires. Defines "making of fires," which under current law a locality can regulate or prohibit, as any use of a flame, including bonfires, cooking stoves, torches, and candles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local regulation; making of fires.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Counties, Cities and Towns
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100530D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152922.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback