VA HB635 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of relief from collateral criminal consequences. Creates a procedure whereby a person who has been convicted of certain crimes can petition the court for a certificate of relief that will remove collateral consequences of the conviction. Persons cannot petition for relief for violent crimes nor for crimes for which registration on the sex offender registry is required, must wait 12 months after the completion of all terms of sentencing and probation, and must not have any pending criminal charges. The court may limit the effect of the certificate of relief and it can be revoked if the person is subsequently convicted of a crime.
Title
Criminal convictions; procedure for petition certificate of relief.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | Stricken from docket by Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2016-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100952D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB635 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB635+hil |