VA HB63 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax; exemption for certain nonprofit entities. Provides exemptions from sales and use tax and local license taxes for certain nonprofit veterans organizations. The sales and use tax exemption shall not be used by a nonprofit veterans organization for purchases of tangible personal property that is used primarily (i) for social and recreational activities for members or (ii) for providing insurance benefits to members or their dependents.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for certain nonprofit entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB63ER) |
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 16100756D-E |
2016-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB63E |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2016-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100756D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 609.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |