VA HB63 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-08 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB91-Albo) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on December 7 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-08 - House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB91-Albo) by voice vote
Summary
Forfeiture of motor vehicle for two or more offenses of driving without a valid operator's license. Provides that any motor vehicle owned by the operator and used to commit a second offense of driving without a valid operator's license shall be forfeited. Also the bill provides that any vehicle knowingly used to commit a second such violation by a person who is not the owner thereof shall be subject to impoundment under § 46.2-301.1, and the person shall be fined an amount equivalent to the fair market value of the vehicle. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Motor vehicle; forfeiture thereof for two or more offenses of driving without valid license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-08 | House: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (HB91-Albo) by voice vote | |
2008-01-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2007-12-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2007-12-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082209616 |
Same As/Similar To
HB91 (Similar To) 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB63 |