VA HB627 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0027)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0027)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Inspections prior to sale; exception; certain special orders. Exempts from the requirement that motor vehicles be inspected prior to retail sale transactions (i) any motor vehicle that is sold on the basis of a special order placed with a dealer or manufacturer outside the Commonwealth by a dealer who makes modifications to such vehicle prior to delivery to the first retail customer who takes delivery outside the Commonwealth and (ii) any new motor vehicle that has previously been inspected and displays a valid state inspection sticker. For a new vehicle sold on the basis of a special order by a dealer on behalf of a nonresident, the bill expands the existing exception for an order placed with a manufacturer outside the Commonwealth to also exempt an order placed with a dealer outside the Commonwealth. The bill contains a technical amendment. This bill is identical to SB 873.
Title
Inspections prior to sale; exception, certain special orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0027) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 27 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 26, 2018 | |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/19/18 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB627ER) |
2018-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-14 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB627H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105742D-H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105742D-H1 |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102168D |