VA HB624 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0901)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Office of the Attorney General; Division of Human Rights; compensation discrimination information. Directs the Division of Human Rights of the Department of Law to develop recommendations regarding the type of information about businesses and their employees and the accompanying methodology that would be required for the Division to proactively enforce provisions of the Code of Virginia requiring equal pay of similarly situated employees irrespective of sex and race. The bill requires the Division to also develop recommendations regarding appropriate enforcement mechanisms, including causes of action and civil remedies, to address discrimination in compensation based on sex and race. In developing such recommendations, the bill directs the Division to engage stakeholders representing employers and employees in the Commonwealth. The bill requires the Division to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly no later than November 30, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Rights, Division of; requirements for equal pay irrespective of sex.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Engrossment (51-Y 39-N) (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0901)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 901 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-17HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
2020-03-12SenateSigned by President
2020-03-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-12HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB624ER)
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N)
2020-03-05HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108625D-S1 (54-Y 45-N)
2020-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
2020-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB624S1
2020-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108625D-S1
2020-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-03-05SenateRead third time
2020-03-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N)
2020-02-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 0-N 3-A)
2020-02-27SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108625D-S1
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N)
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Engrossment (51-Y 39-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute (51-Y 39-N) HB624H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107023D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2020-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 7-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107023D-H1
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101373D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22520(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB624
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB624+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB624H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB624S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB624ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0901+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1101V0052+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0258+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0202V0048+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0247+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0290+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0660+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0862+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0228+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0492+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1529HB0624+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1588HB0624+HB0624
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1944+HB0624

Bill Comments

feedback