VA HB624 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Protective orders. Provides that a court may include in a protective order provisions prohibiting harm to a companion animal.
Title
Protective orders; companion animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB972-Cline) by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102327D |
Same As/Similar To
HB972 (Similar To) 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 253.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 253.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 279.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB624 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB624+hil |