VA HB62 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Local and regional libraries; boards not mandatory; Caroline County. Adds Caroline County to the list of localities that are not required to establish a library board. This bill is identical to SB 396.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Libraries, local and regional; boards not mandatory in Caroline County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
2018-03-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 213 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB62ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateRead third time
2018-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-01HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101360D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
42136(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB62
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB62+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB62ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0213+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1104V0020+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1104V0040+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1104V0053+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0083+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0393+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0146+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0596HB0062+HB0062
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0620HB0062+HB0062

Bill Comments

feedback