VA HB614 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Conformity with Internal Revenue Code. Advances the date as of which Virginia's system of taxation conforms with the Internal Revenue Code (IRC) from December 31, 2008, to December 31, 2009, and adds two new exceptions; the deferral of certain income under §108 (i) of the IRC, and the original issue discount on applicable high yield discount obligations under IRC §163 (e)(5)(F). Taxpayers are preparing and filing returns during the Session, therefore, the bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Income tax laws; conformity to Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-10 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105333D-H1 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/10 10102662D |