VA HB611 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; governing boards; educational programs. Requires all members of governing boards of public institutions of higher education to participate in educational programs designed to address the role, duties, and responsibilities of the governing boards at least once within the first two years of membership and at least once within every two years of membership thereafter. Under current law, new members are required to participate in such programs at least once during their first two years of membership. The bill directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to develop educational materials for board members with more than two years of service on a governing board and develop criteria by which such members shall demonstrate compliance.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; governing board, educational programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 156 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB611ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB611H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106389D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106389D-H1 |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102560D |