VA HB607 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0296)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0296)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Commission to End Hunger established; report. Establishes the Virginia Commission to End Hunger. The bill states that the purpose of the Commission is to develop an action plan every two years for ending hunger in the Commonwealth, review the progress of such plan, and ensure cross-collaboration among government entities and community partners toward the goal of ending hunger in the Commonwealth.
Title
End Hunger, Virginia Commission to; established, report, sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0296) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 296 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB607ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103375D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
General Assembly
Study Commissions Committees and Reports