VA HB600 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Family day homes; storage of firearms. Requires that during hours of operation, all firearms in a licensed family day home, registered family day home, or family day home approved by a family day system be stored unloaded in a locked container, compartment, or cabinet, and that all ammunition be stored in a separate locked container, compartment, or cabinet. The bill requires that the key or combination to such locked containers, compartments, or cabinets be inaccessible to all children in the home.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family day homes, licensed, etc.; storage of unloaded firearms in a locked container, cabinet, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB600ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (55-Y 44-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference report agreed to by House (55-Y 44-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference substitute printed 20109752D-H1
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-04SenateSenators: Hanger, McClellan, Morrissey
2020-03-04SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-03HouseDelegates: Hope, Bourne, Coyner
2020-03-03HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-03HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-02SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate insisted on substitute (24-Y 16-N)
2020-02-27HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
2020-02-27HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20108813D-S1 (1-Y 98-N)
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-25SenatePassed Senate with substitute (27-Y 12-N)
2020-02-25SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB600S1
2020-02-25SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108813D-S1
2020-02-25SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-25SenateRead third time
2020-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108813D-S1
2020-02-21SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2020-02-17SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-02-17SenateRereferred from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2020-02-03HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102002D

Same As/Similar To

SB593 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152914(n/a)See Bill Text
6321701.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB600&201+sum+HB600
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB600+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB600S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB600H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB600ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1501V0018+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H15V0043+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0865+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0346+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0143+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0930HB0600+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0979HB0600+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1560+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1320HB0600+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1708HB0600+HB0600
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2068+HB0600

Bill Comments

feedback