VA HB60 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 118 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Substitute judges; powers and duties; entry of a final order. Gives a substitute judge the power to enter a final order in any case heard by such substitute judge for a period of 14 days after the date of a hearing of such case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judges, substitute; powers and duties, entry of a final order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 118 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020
2020-02-24SenateSigned by President
2020-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB60ER)
2020-02-21HouseEnrolled
2020-02-19SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateRead third time
2020-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateReported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-28HouseVOTE: (97-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseReported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-12-03HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-12-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101589D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16169.21(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB60&201+sum+HB60
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB60+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB60ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0802V0014+HB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0010+HB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0118+HB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0354+HB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0702HB0060+HB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0710HB0060+HB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0730HB0060+HB0060
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0731HB0060+HB0060

Bill Comments

feedback