VA HB60 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax subtraction for National Guard pay. Increases from $3,000 to $5,000 the maximum individual income tax subtraction for National Guard pay. Under current law, the annual subtraction for wages or salary received for service in the National Guard of the Commonwealth of Virginia is the lesser of $3,000 or the amount of income derived by the person from 39 calendar days of such service. Under this bill, the subtraction is the lesser of $5,000 or the amount of income derived from 39 calendar days of National Guard service. The income tax subtraction will continue to be available only to persons in the ranks of O3 and below.
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for National Guard pay.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-08 | House | Continued to 2017 in Finance by voice vote |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-12-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100312D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB60 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB60+hil |