VA HB6 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices; source of funds. Adds discrimination on the basis of a person's source of funds to the list of unlawful discriminatory housing practices. The bill creates an exemption for an owner or owner's managing agent, provided that such owner does not own more than four rental dwelling units or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units in the Commonwealth at the time of the alleged discriminatory housing practice. The bill allows an owner or owner's managing agent to deny or limit a person's rental or occupancy of a rental dwelling unit based on the person's source of funds for that unit if such source is not approved within 15 days of the person's submission of the request for tenancy approval. The bill defines "source of funds" as any source that lawfully provides funds to or on behalf of a renter or buyer of housing, including any assistance, benefit, or subsidy program, whether such program is administered by a governmental or nongovernmental entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices, sources of funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 38-N) (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0477)
2020-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 477 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-07SenateSigned by President
2020-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB6ER)
2020-03-07HouseEnrolled
2020-03-04HouseVOTE: Adoption (57-Y 38-N)
2020-03-04HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (57-Y 38-N)
2020-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-03SenatePassed Senate with amendments (25-Y 15-N)
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-03-03SenateRead third time
2020-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2020-03-02SenateAmendment by Senator McCLellan agreed to
2020-03-02SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-03-02SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2020-03-02SenateRead third time
2020-02-28SenatePassed by for the day
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
2020-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (8-Y 6-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (61-Y 37-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 37-N)
2020-02-07HousePending question ordered
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB6H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107395D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseIncorporates HB357 (Lopez)
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107395D-H1
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2019-11-18HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-11-18HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100177D

Same As/Similar To

HB357 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by General Laws

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB6&201+sum+HB6
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB6+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB6H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB6ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0477+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0052+HB0006
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0079+HB0006
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0245+HB0006
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0584+HB0006
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0185+HB0006
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0479+HB0006
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB0006+HB0006
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1442HB0006+HB0006
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1819+HB0006

Bill Comments

feedback