VA HB6 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-3)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Security freezes; elimination of fees. Prohibits a credit reporting agency from requiring a consumer to pay a fee to place a security freeze on the consumer's credit report. Currently, a consumer may be required to pay a fee of no more than $10 to place a security freeze on his credit report. Victims of identity theft are currently exempt from the fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Security freezes; elimination of fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-25HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-11-20HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100357D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591444.2(n/a)See Bill Text
591444.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback