VA HB6 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Continued to 2017 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Continued to 2017 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign Finance Disclosure Act; unlawful conversion of political contributions to personal use; penalty. Prohibits any person from converting any moneys, securities, or like intangible personal property that has been contributed to a candidate, a campaign committee, or a political committee to his personal use or the personal use of any other person. A contribution is considered to be converted to personal use if the contribution, in whole or in part, is used to fulfill any commitment, obligation, or expense not related to the ordinary and necessary expenses related to seeking, holding, or maintaining public office or carrying out the ordinary activities of the committee. The bill provides that a violation of the prohibition is a Class 1 misdemeanor. Current law prohibits such conversion of contributions to personal use specifically with regard to disbursement of surplus funds at the dissolution of a campaign or political committee. The bill also requires the State Board of Elections to provide, upon request, formal advisory opinions regarding the permitted and prohibited uses of contributions and publish such opinions on the Department of Elections website.
Title
Campaign Finance Disclosure Act; unlawful conversion of political contributions to personal use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | Continued to 2017 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-11-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100265D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 945.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 948.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 949.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 950.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 951.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 952.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB6 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB6+hil |