VA HB594 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; general registrars. Permits a general registrar who (i) is involuntarily separated and (ii) has 20 or more years of creditable service to retire with an unreduced allowance upon attaining age 50.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; general registrars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101091D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB594 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB594+hil |