VA HB591 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Health Reinsurance Program; payment parameters. Requires the State Corporation Commission, in setting the payment parameters for the upcoming benefits year, to set such payment parameters at levels designed to achieve the premium reduction target established in the general appropriation act or, if such target is not established in the general appropriation act, the premium reduction target of the previous benefit year.
Title
Commonwealth Health Reinsurance Program; payment parameters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 293 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB591ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100508D |