VA HB589 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of Data Governance and Analytics; reciprocal data-sharing agreements; veteran-specific data. Allows the Office of Data Governance and Analytics to enter into reciprocal data agreements with state agencies for the purpose of sharing veteran-specific data in order to support data-informed outreach plans for veterans.
Title
Data Governance and Analytics, Office of; reciprocal data-sharing agreements, veteran-specific data.
Sponsors
Del. Jackie Glass [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 292 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB589ER) |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Communications |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101989D |