VA HB589 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Community services boards; funding formula; population and need. Adds the total population of the area served by each community services board and the level of need for services provided by a community services board among the population of the area served to the list of criteria the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services must consider when allocating state-controlled funds to community services boards.
Title
Community services boards; funding formula, population and need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102117D |