VA HB588 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; wine liter tax. Requires the portion of the wine liter tax collected from the sale of wine produced by farm wineries to be deposited in the Virginia Wine Promotion Fund for use by the Wine Board.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; portion of wine liter tax collected to be deposited in Wine Promotion Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 362 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB588ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee amendment rejected | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102328D |