VA HB585 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Education and Superintendent of Public Instruction; revisions to Standard of Learning summative assessments. Directs the Secretary of Education and the Superintendent of Public Instruction to convene and consult a work group to revise the Standards of Learning summative assessments of proficiency and to develop a plan for implementation of such revised assessments that shall consider best practices and innovations in summative assessments of proficiency, alternative approaches to current and new assessment items, assessment items that include open-ended questions, long-form writing, and other tasks, a plan for pilot implementation of such assessment items prior to the 2027–2028 school year, the development of a bank of vetted sample assessment items, recommended legislative and regulatory changes and funding necessary to implement approaches considered by the work group, and a proposed timeline for implementation. The bill requires the Department of Education to submit its initial plan for implementation of revised Standards of Learning summative assessments developed by the work group to the General Assembly no later than November 1, 2023, with annual updates on implementation of such plan no later than November 1 each year thereafter through 2027. Secretary of Education and Superintendent of Public Instruction; revisions to Standard of Learning summative assessments. Directs the Secretary of Education and the Superintendent of Public Instruction to convene and consult a work group to revise the Standards of Learning summative assessments of proficiency and to develop a plan for implementation of such revised assessments that shall consider best practices and innovations in summative assessments of proficiency, alternative approaches to current and new assessment items, assessment items that include open-ended questions, long-form writing, and other tasks, a plan for pilot implementation of such assessment items prior to the 2027–2028 school year, the development of a bank of vetted sample assessment items, recommended legislative and regulatory changes and funding necessary to implement approaches considered by the work group, and a proposed timeline for implementation. The bill requires the Department of Education to submit its initial plan for implementation of revised Standards of Learning summative assessments developed by the work group to the General Assembly no later than November 1, 2023, with annual updates on implementation of such plan no later than November 1 each year thereafter through 2027.
Title
SOL; work group to revise summative assessments, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 760 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB585ER2) |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (33-Y 7-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 3-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 3-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's substitute printed 22108141D-H3 |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB585ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (20-Y 19-N) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 4-N 2-A) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB585H2 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 22106487D-H2 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee on Education substitute rejected 22105747D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106487D-H2 |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105747D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102169D |
Subjects
Education
Education Secretary of
Standards of Learning
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Education Secretary of
Standards of Learning
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation