VA HB585 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Magistrates; additional compensation. Allows localities to provide additional compensation to magistrates by removing language that prohibited such funding if such additional compensation was not already provided prior to June 30, 2008. The bill also removes language that prevents localities from increasing the total amount of additional compensation provided after June 30, 2008. The bill does not change the provision that the total amount of such additional compensation by localities may not exceed 50 percent of the amount paid by the Commonwealth to magistrates.
Title
Magistrates; additional compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102484D |