VA HB583 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - House: Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - House: Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local restrictions on farm businesses. Provides that local restriction upon activities and events at farm businesses to market and sell their products shall be reasonable and shall take into account the economic impact on the farm business of such restriction and whether such activities and events are usual and customary for farm businesses throughout the Commonwealth. The bill further provides that no local ordinance regulating noise, other than outdoor amplified music, arising from activities and events at farm businesses shall be more restrictive than that in the general noise ordinance.
Title
Farm businesses; local restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | House: Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102361D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB583 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB583+hil |