VA HB577 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Interpleader; earnest money deposits. Allows the general district court, in an interpleader case involving an earnest money deposit held in escrow by a real estate broker, to escheat the funds to the Commonwealth to be credited to the Virginia Housing Trust Fund upon default of the stakeholders, provided that such funds have been abandoned for more than one year from the date of written notice to all stakeholders and claimants and the plaintiff and defendants are in default in the interpleader action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interpleader; funds held in escrow.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 70-N 1-A) (Y: 30 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-20 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2016-04-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, May 20, 2016
2016-04-20HouseCommunicated to Governor
2016-04-20HouseVOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 70-N 1-A)
2016-04-20HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (29-Y 70-N 1-A)
2016-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-04-08HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2016-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
2016-03-06SenateSigned by President
2016-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-03HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB577ER)
2016-03-03HouseEnrolled
2016-03-02HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2016-03-02HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 16105777D-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
2016-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-29SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2016-02-29SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2016-02-29SenatePassed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2016-02-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB577S1
2016-02-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 16105777D-S1
2016-02-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2016-02-29SenateRead third time
2016-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 16105777D-S1
2016-02-24SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
2016-02-03SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2016-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2016-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 16100947D-E
2016-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB577E
2016-02-01HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2016-02-01HouseRead second time
2016-01-29HouseRead first time
2016-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2016-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
2016-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil Law
2016-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2016-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100947D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16177(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB577
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB577+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB577E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB577S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB577ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0802V0034+HB0577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H08V0018+HB0577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0194+HB0577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S03V0308+HB0577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0676HB0577+HB0577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0693HB0577+HB0577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0716HB0577+HB0577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0717HB0577+HB0577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1107+HB0577
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV1412+HB0577

Bill Comments

feedback