VA HB572 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
District court; acting chief judge. Provides a procedure for the assumption of the duties of a chief judge of a district court and notification of other judges in the event the chief judge is unable to perform his duties. This bill is a recommendation of the Judicial Council.
Title
District court; procedure for assumption of duties of chief judge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 560 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB572ER) | |
2010-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Judicial Systems | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100823D |
Same As/Similar To
SB146 (Same As) 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0596)