VA HB566 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council; annual inspection of disclosure forms. Requires the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council to conduct an annual inspection of a random sample of disclosure statements filed with the Council to determine compliance with applicable disclosure requirements and limitations on gifts, the accuracy of information disclosed, and whether filing deadlines were met. The bill requires such random sample to include the disclosure forms of (i) one member of the House of Delegates and one Senator and (ii) one percent of all state officers and employees and one percent of all lobbyists who file such forms.
Title
Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council; annual inspection of disclosure forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-26 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100900D |