VA HB560 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780)
Summary
Commitment hearing; independent examiner or community services board member attending. Requires the independent examiner and the community services board employee or designee who prepared the prescreening report, or if the hearing occurs in a different jurisdiction, an employee or designee of the local community services board or behavioral health authority serving that jurisdiction, to attend the commitment hearing or, if physical attendance is not practicable, to participate in the hearing through a two-way electronic video and audio or telephonic communication system. The bill also provides that the initial period of involuntary commitment shall be 30 days and allows for a subsequent order authorizing an additional period of 180 days. The bill also sets forth conditions for when a person may be ordered to mandatory outpatient treatment.
Title
Commitment hearing; community services board representative, treating physician, etc. to attend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0780) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 780 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB560ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 089659432-S2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB560S2 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Cuccinelli agreed to 089659432-S2 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 089659432-S2 (Cuccinelli) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 080299248-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080299248-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB560H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081471432-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources (Hamilton) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 081471432-H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-25 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081447432 |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB560 |