VA HB547 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB547

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Energy and Economy Transition Council established. Establishes the Virginia Energy and Economy Transition Council, consisting of 30 members, to develop plans to assist the Commonwealth in transitioning from the use of fossil fuel energy to renewable energy by 2050. The bill provides that the Council sunsets on July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Energy and Economy Transition Council; established, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (9-Y 4-N)
2020-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N)
2020-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB547H1
2020-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106878D-H1
2020-01-31HouseRead second time
2020-01-30HouseRead first time
2020-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 8-N)
2020-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106878D-H1
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
2020-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-15HouseReferred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2020-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103810D

Same As/Similar To

HB547 (Carry Over) 2020-03-02 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback